Accounts and annual returns CUDDINGTON COMMUNITY PRIMARY SCHOOL FUND

Charity number: 1102024
Charity reporting is overdue by 458 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 92 days
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 92 days
Annual return 05 April 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 458 days
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 458 days
Annual return 05 April 2022 23 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2021 19 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2020 14 March 2021 37 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required