Financial history CLEETHORPES CHILDCARE

Charity number: 1102007
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £356.01k £293.20k £324.86k £275.88k £228.10k
Total expenditure £350.69k £330.39k £324.56k £288.32k £236.73k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £292.94k N/A £230.95k £273.34k N/A