Financial history THE WHITELEY HOMES TRUST

Charity number: 1103056
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £8.01m £8.61m £8.69m £8.81m £7.96m
Total expenditure £9.35m £12.77m £8.94m £9.01m £12.44m
Income from government contracts £720.57k £841.40k £1.02m £30.30k £52.30k
Income from government grants £3.94k £296.73k £244.63k £50.72k £165.00k
Income - Donations and legacies £105.25k £341.63k £315.49k £103.48k £44.96k
Income - Other trading activities £455.91k £631.28k £722.14k £941.95k £968.45k
Income - Charitable activities £6.63m £7.40m £7.43m £7.56m £6.46m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £107.60k £125.42k £113.41k £131.27k £157.92k
Income - Other £709.75k £106.48k £111.48k £77.24k £324.45k
Income - Legacies £11.61k £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £9.35m £9.39m £8.35m £8.36m £7.76m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £77.21k £107.32k £19.40k £49.56k
Expenditure - Governance £24.93k £74.02k £41.13k £31.89k £47.20k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £600
Expenditure - Other £0 £3.31m £482.80k £628.72k £4.63m