THE WHITELEY HOMES TRUST

Charity number: 1103056
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Provision of housing and related services (including, extra-care, residential care and nursing care) to older people of limited means.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

One or more trustees are also directors of the subsidiaries

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Accommodation/housing
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Surrey

Governance

Registration history:
  • 13 January 2005: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • WHITELEY VILLAGE (Working name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Care Quality Commission
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
David Jenkins Trustee 26 March 2025
None on record
Elizabeth Anne Hauxwell Trustee 18 December 2024
None on record
Jaswant Joshi Trustee 18 December 2024
None on record
Sanjay Gulati Trustee 26 June 2024
None on record
Craig Bryant Trustee 02 October 2023
None on record
Nathan Rees Trustee 27 September 2023
None on record
Alison Halliday Kennedy Trustee 12 October 2022
None on record
Robbie Lewis Young Trustee 29 September 2022
None on record
Mark Henderson Trustee 30 March 2021
None on record
Melanie Lindsay Trustee 18 June 2019
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £8.01m £8.61m £8.69m £8.81m £7.96m
Total expenditure £9.35m £12.77m £8.94m £9.01m £12.44m
Income from government contracts £720.57k £841.40k £1.02m £30.30k £52.30k
Income from government grants £3.94k £296.73k £244.63k £50.72k £165.00k
Income - Donations and legacies £105.25k £341.63k £315.49k £103.48k £44.96k
Income - Other trading activities £455.91k £631.28k £722.14k £941.95k £968.45k
Income - Charitable activities £6.63m £7.40m £7.43m £7.56m £6.46m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £107.60k £125.42k £113.41k £131.27k £157.92k
Income - Other £709.75k £106.48k £111.48k £77.24k £324.45k
Income - Legacies £11.61k £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £9.35m £9.39m £8.35m £8.36m £7.76m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £77.21k £107.32k £19.40k £49.56k
Expenditure - Governance £24.93k £74.02k £41.13k £31.89k £47.20k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £600
Expenditure - Other £0 £3.31m £482.80k £628.72k £4.63m

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Own use assets £52.96m £49.81m £48.99m £48.19m £44.22m
Long-term investments £8.78m £9.16m £6.34m £5.70m £6.25m
Other assets £1.99m £1.34m £4.26m £4.26m £3.23m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £852.00k £697.00k £1.15m £1.25m £1.17m
Total liabilities £17.46m £17.83m £16.63m £16.06m £15.59m

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 11 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 11 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 30 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 30 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 31 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 31 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 29 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 29 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 12 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 12 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
WILL PROVED 16TH APRIL 1907-SEE U.V.165P.402 COURT ORDER DATED 19TH MAY 1952 AND SCHEMES 2/12/65 AND 29/07/02 AS AFFECTED BY A UNITING DIRECTION (MADE UNDER S.96 OF THE CHARITIES ACT 1993) AND DATED 23 DECEMBER 2004. AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 14 MAR 2017
Charitable objects
HOMES FOR PERSONS OF SMALL MEANS WHO HAVE REACHED RETIREMENT AGE OF 65 (MEN) AND 60 (WOMEN), PREFERENCE BEING GIVEN TO THOSE WHO HAVE BEEN ENGAGED IN COMMERCIAL OR AGRICULTURAL PURSUITS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
  • 13 January 2005 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
Huntley House
Octagon Road
Whiteley Village
Hersham
WALTON-ON-THAMES
KT12 4BF
Phone:
01932842360