Linked charities THE WHITELEY HOMES TRUST
Charity Number: 1103056

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Linked charities
Governing document
WILL PROVED 16TH APRIL 1907-SEE U.V.165P.402 COURT ORDER DATED 19TH MAY 1952 AND SCHEMES 2/12/65 AND 29/07/02 AS AFFECTED BY A UNITING DIRECTION (MADE UNDER S.96 OF THE CHARITIES ACT 1993) AND DATED 23 DECEMBER 2004.
AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 14 MAR 2017
Charitable objects
HOMES FOR PERSONS OF SMALL MEANS WHO HAVE REACHED RETIREMENT AGE OF 65 (MEN) AND 60 (WOMEN), PREFERENCE BEING GIVEN TO THOSE WHO HAVE BEEN ENGAGED IN COMMERCIAL OR AGRICULTURAL PURSUITS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
- 13 January 2005 : Standard registration
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.