Trustees WELSH REFUGEE COUNCIL
Charity number: 1102449

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Mohammad Alhadj Ali | Chair | 10 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Harry Iles | Trustee | 28 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Buhir Rafiq | Trustee | 05 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Shaun Bera | Trustee | 23 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Hawar Ameen | Trustee | 22 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Hoyam Osman | Trustee | 07 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mike Chick | Trustee | 27 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Morgan | Trustee | 02 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Owen Burgess | Trustee | 02 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Catherine McKeag | Trustee | 30 March 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.