ANTIOCH (NORTH WALES)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Usual activities associated with the Christian church, including bus ministry, in particular to young people, and a debt advice service.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
No other names
- Financial Conduct Authority
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Claire Heeley | Trustee | 10 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
James Sheridan | Trustee | 07 May 2020 |
|
|||||
JENNIFER HOLLAND | Trustee | 03 July 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2019 | 30/11/2020 | 30/11/2021 | 30/11/2022 | 30/11/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £104.49k | £107.90k | £47.12k | £92.33k | £70.80k | |
|
Total expenditure | £50.50k | £45.38k | £37.10k | £87.90k | £64.72k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £25.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | 10 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | 10 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | 11 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | 11 August 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | 20 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | 30 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | 17 March 2022 | 168 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2020 | 17 March 2022 | 168 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2019 | 19 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2019 | 19 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION DATED 5 NOVEMBER 2003
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH AND THE WORSHIP OF GOD IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND OVERSEAS WITH PARTICULAR REFERENCE TO WALES BY ANY MEANS WHATSOEVER INCLUDING (BUT NOT BY WAY OF LIMITATION) THE PREACHING AND PROCLAMATION OF THE CHRISTIAN GOSPEL AND THE TEACHING OF CHRISTIAN DOCTRINE AND PRINCIPLES AND THE PASTORAL CARE OF CHRISTIAN PEOPLE AND THE PRINTING AND DISTRIBUTION OF THE BIBLE AND CHRISTIAN LITERATURE INCLUDING VIDEO AND AUDIO RECORDINGS OR TAPES OF ANY OR ANY OTHER MEDIA WHICH IS OR MAY BECOME AVAILABLE.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL, BUT IN PARTICULAR WALES
Contact information
- Address:
-
Antioch Church
Abergele Road
COLWYN BAY
Clwyd
LL29 7PA
- Phone:
- 01492584378
- Email:
- office@antioch.co.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window