Bexhill Museum

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The object of the charity is to provide a museum in order to promote, maintain, improve and advance the education of the public for their benefit particularly by the presentation of exhibitions, lectures and other means of study relating to local history, natural history, archaeology, history of costume, technology, engineering, the arts, ethnography, geology and social history.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £11,500 from 2 government grant(s)
People

10 Trustee(s)
60 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- East Sussex
Governance
- 15 March 2004: Standard registration
- BEXHILL MUSEUM LIMITED (Previous name)
- THE SOCIETY OF BEXHILL MUSEUMS LIMITED (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Catherine Julia Hirst | Trustee | 06 December 2023 |
|
|||||
Kim Jayne Byford | Trustee | 06 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jason Bradley Trainor | Trustee | 06 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dan Scales | Trustee | 07 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Martin Bell | Trustee | 07 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Gordon Roy Smith | Trustee | 09 October 2019 |
|
|||||
Peggy Anne Goodberry | Trustee | 09 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sally Hemmings | Trustee | 09 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Anne Geraldine Stacey | Trustee | 03 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Georgina Doris Bradley | Trustee | 07 August 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £96.99k | £123.71k | £136.75k | £126.54k | £110.66k | |
|
Total expenditure | £111.95k | £108.76k | £140.30k | £122.44k | £119.52k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £8.50k | £55.71k | £34.47k | £32.00k | £11.50k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 06 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 06 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 03 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 03 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 24 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 24 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 04 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 04 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 11 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 11 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 11/11/2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 10/02/2004 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 19/10/2012 as amended on 20 Oct 2021 as amended on 20 Oct 2021
Charitable objects
PROVIDING A MUSEUM IN ORDER TO PROMOTE MAINTAIN IMPROVE AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC FOR THEIR BENEFIT PARTICULARLY BY THE PRESENTATION OF EXHIBITIONS LECTURES AND OTHER MEANS OF STUDY RELATING TO THE DISPLAY OF LOCAL HISTORY NATURAL HISTORY ARCHAEOLOGY THE HISTORY OF COSTUME TECHNOLOGY AND ENGINEERING THE ARTS ETHNOGRAPHY GEOLOGY AND SOCIAL HISTORY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE BEXHILL ON SEA
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Museum
Egerton Road
Bexhill-on-Sea
TN39 3HL
- Phone:
- 01424213026
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window