Financial history TRANS-ATLANTIC AND PACIFIC ALLIANCE OF CHURCHES (TAPAC)

Charity number: 1103461
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £21.18k £16.04k £5.80k £5.60k £3.00k
Total expenditure £21.03k £14.15k £5.00k £4.56k £500
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A