Accounts and annual returns THE MANSION OPEN HOUSE MOBILE

Charity number: 1102665
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2011 26 November 2012 26 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2011 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2010 26 November 2012 392 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2010 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2009 26 November 2012 757 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2009 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2008 13 October 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2008 13 October 2009 On Time