Accounts and annual returns BROADHEMPSTON SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER AND FRIENDS ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 1101091
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2024 02 May 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2023 31 August 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2022 17 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2021 19 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2020 05 September 2021 5 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2020 Not Required