Accounts and annual returns RONALD MCDONALD HOUSE, TOOTING

Charity number: 1101391
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2008 09 February 2009 4 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2008 09 February 2009 4 days late
Annual return 05 April 2007 31 January 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2007 31 January 2008 On Time
Annual return 05 April 2006 15 December 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2006 17 November 2006 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2005 20 January 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2005 26 January 2006 On Time