PALLIATIVE CARE SERVICES, HYDERABAD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
At present, the charity is not active, this is because we have been unable to find suitable volunteers, organisations to do the work of offering palliative care to patients in Hyderabad, India. We have also stopped raising money for the charity.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- India
Governance
- 26 January 2004: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr CHANDRA SEKHAR BHIMARASETTY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr BAKUL KUMAR | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 20 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 23 May 2024 | 84 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 06 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 01 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 16 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 5 NOVEMBER 2003 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 9 JANUARY 2004
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE RELIEF OF PERSONS WITH TERMINAL ILLNESSES SUCH AS CANCER AND HIV/AIDS IN ANDHRA PRADESH, INDIA BY THE PROVISION OF HOME BASED PALLIATIVE CARE SERVICES AND TO PROVIDE SUPPORT SERVICES, RESPITE ASSISTANCE AND BEREAVEMENT SERVICES TO THEIR FAMILIES AND CARERS.
Area of benefit
ANDHRA PRADESH, INDIA
Contact information
- Address:
-
14 St. Catherines Road
Blackwell
Bromsgrove
B60 1BN
- Phone:
- 07768991454
- Email:
- bkumar841@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window