Financial history EDMUND WALLER COMMUNITY SERVICES

Charity number: 1102482
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £148.77k £129.48k £199.98k £182.52k £108.48k
Total expenditure £126.29k £114.23k £194.53k £151.99k £128.88k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A