Financial history FAITH TABERNACLE

Charity number: 1102945
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2019 31/10/2020 31/10/2021 31/10/2022 31/10/2023
Total gross income £32.53k £38.21k £44.82k £49.35k £46.10k
Total expenditure £33.89k £22.32k £19.19k £39.26k £69.02k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A