Financial history THE FOSTER WOOD FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1101364
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £370.55k £463.66k £368.36k £216.94k £227.02k
Total expenditure £377.86k £470.38k £392.22k £220.31k £212.42k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A