URBAN STRAWBERRY LUNCH
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
USL make music using unusual instruments and materials and in unusual spaces. We offer learning and education services to a wide variety of clients including schools, community groups and businesses; we perform all over the country in parks, gardens, shopping centres, streets, museums and galleries .....; and we promote the regeneration of much loved local landmarks through creative use
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2013
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 23 January 2004: Standard registration
- 19 June 2015: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2009 | 31/03/2010 | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £126.95k | £87.41k | £87.59k | £87.43k | £48.21k | |
|
Total expenditure | £115.97k | £98.66k | £89.97k | £95.57k | £71.79k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | 20 March 2014 | 48 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | 20 March 2014 | 48 days late | |
Annual return | 31 March 2012 | 10 January 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2012 | 10 January 2013 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 29 MAY 1997
Charitable objects
(I) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE ART OF CREATIVITY OF SOUND AND MUSIC BY THE PROMOTION OF THE STUDY OF AND THE TRAINING OF THE PUBLIC IN SOUND AND MUSIC PRODUCTION AND THE PROVISION OF WORKSHOPS AND RESIDENCY PROJECTS, CREATING SOUND AND MUSIC USING ANY OBJECT, PROMOTING PUBLIC PERFORMANCES, CONCERTS, AND PERFORMANCE AND MOVEMENT WHETHER BY LIVE PERFORMANCE, RECORDING, RADIO, CINEMA, TELEVISION OR ANY OTHER RELATED MEDIA (II) FOR THE GENERAL BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN SUCH A MANNER IN PROMOTION OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS AS MAY BE CHARITABLE
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window