WILSFORD VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
to provide meeting place for the inhabintants of Wilsford and Kelby for social activities and religious meetings, youth clubs. dancing,social meetings, performing arts, indoor sport
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Lincolnshire
Governance
- 13 July 2005: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Helen Sirs | Chair | 10 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Janis Smith | Trustee | 10 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jody Baker | Trustee | 10 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jenny Ann Harrison | Trustee | 10 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Charles Roger Sirs | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jackie Parker | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Stephanie Heathcote | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
JAYNE SADLER | Trustee | 01 March 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.78k | £11.77k | £2.36k | £8.59k | £10.34k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.35k | £12.40k | £1.78k | £9.25k | £11.51k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £1.50k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 08 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 11 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 27 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 22 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 14 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 7 JULY 2005
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY OBJECTS ARE TO PROVIDE A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE VILLAGE(S) OF [WILSFORD AND KELBY ] AND THE PARISH OF [WILSFORD AND KELBY] IN THE COUNTY OF [LINCOLNSHIRE] WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, AGE, DISABILITY, NATIONALITY, RACE OR POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, INCLUDING THE USE OF THE PROPERTY FOR MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES OR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
WILSFORD AND KELBY
Contact information
- Address:
-
38 School Lane
Wilsford
GRANTHAM
Lincolnshire
NG32 3PD
- Phone:
- 01400230401
- Email:
- wilsfordhall@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window