Accounts and annual returns THE ESTELLE TRUST

Charity number: 1101299
Charity reporting is up to date (10 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 10 February 2025 10 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 10 February 2025 10 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 23 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 23 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 06 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 06 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 26 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 26 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 19 February 2021 19 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 19 February 2021 19 days late Download Open in new window