STRAIGHT TALKING PEER EDUCATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Straight Talking employs teenage mothers and young fathers to deliver an interactive programme in schools to 13-17 year olds presenting the realities and implications of early parenthood; enabling them to make responsible choices. The charity works simultaneously to reduce teenage pregnancy rates and support young parents into employment and become financially independent of State benefits.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England
Governance
- 26 January 2004: Standard registration
- STRAIGHT TALKING (Working name)
- THE STRAIGHT TALKING PROJECT (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lauren Park | Trustee | 19 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Aayesha Hassan | Trustee | 19 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Shaun Spalding | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Peter Glynne | Trustee | 10 February 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £254.78k | £298.59k | £56.23k | £53.24k | £362 | |
|
Total expenditure | £377.62k | £327.81k | £162.74k | £77.83k | £4.97k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 06 June 2024 | 6 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 14 July 2023 | 44 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 14 July 2023 | 44 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 14 July 2023 | 409 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 14 July 2023 | 409 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 14 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 14 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 08 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | 08 April 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 27 NOVEMBER 2003
Charitable objects
TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT THE HEALTH AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF YOUNG PEOPLE IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF COURSES IN PREGNANCY, PARENTING AND SEX EDUCATION FOR SUCH YOUNG PERSONS, PARENTS, GUARDIANS AND OTHER PROFESSIONALS IN THIS FIELD.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE ENGLAND, WALES AND RUSSIA
Contact information
- Address:
-
3 Parbury Rise
CHESSINGTON
Surrey
KT9 2ER
- Phone:
- 0208 391 1079
- Email:
- botterillschess@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window