CEREBRAL PALSY TODAY (IN COVENTRY & WARWICKSHIRE) LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO PROVIDE HELP AND SUPPORT FOR PEOPLE LIVING WITH CEREBRAL PALSY, THEIR CARERS AND THEIR FAMILIES. WE PROVIDE A VARIETY OF SERVICES: LOW COST HOLIDAY ACCOMMODATION, WELFARE GRANTS AND LOANS, ADVOCACY, A TRANSPORT SERVICE, INDIVIDUAL SUPPORT, SOCIAL EVENTS, DAY TRIPS, SUPPORT GROUPS AND HELP AND ADVICE ON A RANGE OF DISABILITY ISSUES.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Coventry City
- Leicestershire
- Warwickshire
Governance
- 18 February 2004: Standard registration
- COVENTRY & WARWICKSHIRE SCOPE (Working name)
- COVENTRY SCOPE (Working name)
- SCOPE4COVENTRY AND WARWICKSHIRE LIMITED (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DICK HARRIS | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Rebecca Green | Trustee | 15 June 2013 |
|
|
||||
ABIGAIL CURRAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PAULINE CRANER | Trustee |
|
||||||
RACHEL MCDONALD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PETER CURRAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JANET MCDONALD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JAYNE CURRAN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £129.94k | £6.96k | £7.25k | £10.00k | £10.80k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.29k | £10.85k | £13.64k | £14.00k | £20.44k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 14 May 2024 | 104 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 16 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 15 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 10 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 10 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 10 JUN 2003 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 29 APR 2016
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE CARE, WELFARE, INTEREST, TREATMENT, EDUCATION AND ADVANCEMENT IN THE COVENTRY AND WARWICKSHIRE AREA (OR IN THE EVENT OF ANY LOCAL GOVERNMENT RE-ORGANISATION IN AN EQUIVALENT AREA) AND SURROUNDING DISTRICTS OF PEOPLE WITH CEREBRAL PALSY, OR WITH RELATED DISABILITY.
Area of benefit
IN THE COVENTRY AND WARWICKSHIRE AREA (OR IN THE EVENT OF ANY LOCAL GOVERNMENT RE-ORGANISATION IN AN EQUIVALENT AREA)
Contact information
- Address:
-
10 HALL LANE
COVENTRY
WEST MIDLANDS
CV2 2AW
- Phone:
- 02476618943
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window