SEARCH AND RESCUE ASSISTANCE IN DISASTERS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are a specialist disaster response and humanitarian assistance charity that supports both domestic and international communities in times of need affected by disasters natural and man-made. We train and equip dedicated volunteers and members of the public to provide assistance and support to the emergency services
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
60 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Armed Forces/emergency Service Efficiency
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
- Afghanistan
- Akrotiri
- Albania
- Algeria
- American Samoa
- Andorra
- Angola
- Anguilla
- Antarctica
- Antigua And Barbuda
- Argentina
- Armenia
- Aruba
- Australia
- Austria
- Azerbaijan
- Bahrain
- Bangladesh
- Barbados
- Belarus
- Belgium
- Belize
- Benin
- Bermuda
- Bhutan
- Bolivia
- Bosnia And Herzegovina
- Botswana
- Brazil
- British Indian Ocean Territory
- British Virgin Islands
- Brunei
- Bulgaria
- Burkina Faso
- Burma
- Burundi
- Cambodia
- Cameroon
- Canada
- Cape Verde
- Cayman Islands
- Central African Republic
- Chad
- Chile
- China
- Christmas Island
- Cocos (KEELING) ISLANDS
- Colombia
- Comoros
- Congo
- Congo (Democratic Republic)
- Cook Islands
- Costa Rica
- Croatia
- Cuba
- Cyprus
- Czech Republic
- Denmark
- Dhekelia
- Djibouti
- Dominica
- Dominican Republic
- Easter Island
- East Timor
- Ecuador
- Egypt
- El Salvador
- Equatorial Guinea
- Eritrea
- Estonia
- Eswatini
- Ethiopia
- Falkland Islands
- Faroe Islands
- Fiji
- Finland
- France
- French Guiana
- French Polynesia
- Gabon
- Georgia
- Germany
- Ghana
- Gibraltar
- Greece
- Greenland
- Grenada
- Guadeloupe
- Guam
- Guatemala
- Guernsey
- Guinea
- Guinea-bissau
- Guyana
- Haiti
- Honduras
- Hong Kong
- Hungary
- Iceland
- India
- Indonesia
- Iran
- Iraq
- Ireland
- Isle Of Man
- Israel
- Italy
- Ivory Coast
- Jamaica
- Japan
- Jersey
- Jordan
- Kazakhstan
- Kenya
- Kiribati
- Kosovo
- Kuwait
- Kyrgyzstan
- Laos
- Latvia
- Lebanon
- Lesotho
- Liberia
- Libya
- Liechtenstein
- Lithuania
- Luxembourg
- Macau
- Macedonia
- Madagascar
- Malawi
- Malaysia
- Maldives
- Mali
- Malta
- Marshall Islands
- Martinique
- Mauritania
- Mauritius
- Mayotte
- Mexico
- Micronesia
- Moldova
- Monaco
- Mongolia
- Montenegro
- Montserrat
- Morocco
- Mozambique
- Namibia
- Nauru
- Nepal
- Netherlands
- New Caledonia
- New Zealand
- Nicaragua
- Niger
- Nigeria
- Niue
- Norfolk Island
- Northern Ireland
- Northern Mariana Islands
- North Korea
- Norway
- Occupied Palestinian Territories
- Oman
- Pakistan
- Palau
- Panama
- Papua New Guinea
- Paraguay
- Peru
- Philippines
- Pitcairn, Henderson, Ducie And Oeno Islands
- Poland
- Portugal
- Puerto Rico
- Qatar
- Réunion
- Romania
- Russia
- Rwanda
- Saint Barthélemy
- Saint Helena
- Saint Pierre And Miquelon
- Saint Vincent
- Samoa
- San Marino
- São Tomé And Principe
- Saudi Arabia
- Scotland
- Senegal
- Serbia
- Seychelles
- Sierra Leone
- Singapore
- Sint Maarten
- Slovakia
- Slovenia
- Solomon Islands
- Somalia
- South Africa
- South Georgia And South Sandwich Islands
- South Korea
- South Sudan
- Spain
- Sri Lanka
- St Kitts And Nevis
- St Lucia
- Sudan
- Suriname
- Svalbard And Jan Mayen
- Sweden
- Switzerland
- Syria
- Taiwan
- Tajikistan
- Tanzania
- Thailand
- The Bahamas
- The Gambia
- Togo
- Tokelau
- Tonga
- Trinidad And Tobago
- Tunisia
- Turkey
- Turkmenistan
- Turks And Caicos Islands
- Tuvalu
- Uganda
- Ukraine
- United Arab Emirates
- United States
- United States Virgin Islands
- Uruguay
- Uzbekistan
- Vanuatu
- Venezuela
- Vietnam
- Wallis And Futuna
- Yemen
- Zambia
- Zimbabwe
Governance
- 19 January 2004: Standard registration
- S.A.R.A.I.D (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GARY FRANCIS | Chair |
|
|
|||||
David Pickup | Trustee | 19 May 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £26.90k | £38.78k | £29.02k | £100.38k | £13.39k | |
|
Total expenditure | £25.02k | £21.38k | £44.96k | £105.19k | £39.43k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 14 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 14 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 26 April 2021 | 85 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ON 5TH JULY 2003. AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 28 JAN 2018 as amended on 19 May 2019
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE, FOR PUBLIC BENEFIT:- UPON RECEIPT OF A REQUEST FOR ASSISTANCE, TO PROVIDE; 3.1 RELIEF AND ASSISTANCE TO PEOPLE IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD WHO ARE VICTIMS OF ANY DISASTER NATURAL OR MAN-MADE OR CATASTROPHE THROUGH THE RAPID DEPLOYMENT OF VOLUNTEER PERSONNEL SUITABLY TRAINED AND EQUIPPED IN DISASTER RESPONSE TO PROVIDE, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY; URBAN SEARCH AND RESCUE, HUMANITARIAN AID AND DISASTER RELIEF BETWEEN THE MOMENT A DISASTER OR CATASTROPHE OCCURS AND THE POINT AT WHICH CONVENTIONAL DISASTER RELIEF ORGANISATIONS ARE ABLE TO RESPOND, AND ON AN ON-GOING BASIS. 3.2 DISASTER RISK REDUCTION, PREPAREDNESS TRAINING AND MITIGATION INTERVENTIONS; AND TO TRAIN VOLUNTEERS TO FORM RESPONSE TEAMS IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD AFFECTED OR AT RISK FROM DISASTERS. 3.3 RELIEF AND ASSISTANCE TO PEOPLE IN THE UNITED KINGDOM WHO ARE THE VICTIMS OF ANY DISASTER NATURAL OR MAN-MADE OR CATASTROPHE BY PROVIDING VOLUNTEER PERSONNEL REFERRED TO IN ARTICLE 3.1 TO SUPPORT WHERE NEEDED TO RESPONSES OF THE EMERGENCY SERVICES AND OTHER NATIONAL AND REGIONAL ORGANISATIONS TO SUCH OCCURRENCES. 3.4 THE ADVANCEMENT OF COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT AND RESILIENCE BY PROVIDING OPPORTUNITIES FOR VOLUNTEERS TO HELP MEET THE NEEDS OF LOCAL COMMUNITIES IN THE UNITED KINGDOM, AS IDENTIFIED BY AND IN CO-OPERATION WITH THE EMERGENCY SERVICES AND VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS, AND IN DOING SO, TO ALSO PROVIDE VOLUNTEERS WITH THE OPPORTUNITIES TO ACQUIRE, PRACTICE AND GAIN CONFIDENCE IN THE SKILLS REQUIRED TO CARRY OUT THE PURPOSES REFERRED TO IN ARTICLE 3.3 3.5 PROTECT AND PRESERVE LIFE
Area of benefit
ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD
Contact information
- Address:
-
SARAID
Fire Station
Station Road
Yate
BRISTOL
BS37 4AL
- Phone:
- 07803196181
- Email:
- enquiries@saraid.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window