Financial history RECYCLING UNLIMITED

Charity number: 1103796
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £100.70k £105.75k £68.50k £91.38k £85.57k
Total expenditure £80.51k £75.75k £80.31k £88.46k £87.22k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £15.00k £5.45k N/A