Tanio Ltd.

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Community Arts workshops and projects in film, animation, dance, drama, forum theatre, photography, visual and digital arts, music, design, multi-media, storytelling and writing, creating equal opportunities through positive action by prioritising individuals, groups and communities who may be marginalised, vulnerable or at risk
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £5,641 from 1 government contract(s) and £14,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bridgend
- Rhondda Cynon Taff
Governance
- 25 February 2005: Standard registration
- VALLEY AND VALE (Working name)
- VALLEY AND VALE COMMUNITY ARTS (Working name)
- VALLEY & VALE COMMUNITY ARTS LIMITED (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kevin Mably | Chair | 17 March 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Graham Peter Hill | Trustee | 05 December 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Adam Stefan Kurowski Wakeford | Trustee | 05 December 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Sybil Fowler Trustee | Trustee | 05 December 2023 |
|
|||||||
Tom Dyer | Trustee | 11 February 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Kelly Barr | Trustee | 03 December 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Huw Marshall | Trustee | 28 October 2019 |
|
|||||||
Lauren Ivy Davies | Trustee | 05 February 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £210.82k | £254.06k | £264.69k | £240.92k | £308.02k | |
|
Total expenditure | £290.69k | £213.50k | £272.34k | £240.09k | £329.57k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £600 | £5.64k | |
|
Income from government grants | £3.89k | £14.50k | £2.00k | N/A | £14.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 15 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 15 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 27 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 15 MAY 1985 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 28 JANUARY 2005. as amended on 19 Aug 2019 as amended on 10 Sep 2019 as amended on 11 Feb 2020
Charitable objects
The Objects of the Charity are for the public benefit: (a) the advancement of education and training in the arts, (b) the promotion of the arts by promoting and developing community events and performances to facilitate participation in the arts; and (c) the provision of facilities in the interests of social welfare for recreation or other leisure time occupation of individuals who have need of such facilities by reason of their youth, age, infirmity or disability, financial hardship or social circumstances with the object of improving their conditions of life.
Area of benefit
BRIDGEND, BETWS AND SURROUNDING AREAS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
SARDIS MEDIA CENTRE
HEOL DEWI SANT
BETWS
BRIDGEND
CF32 8SU
- Phone:
- 01656729246
- Email:
- admin@taniocymru.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window