Accounts and annual returns THE CHRYSALIS SCHOOL FOR AUTISM LTD

Charity number: 1101424
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 18 May 2012 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 18 May 2012 Not submitted
Annual return 18 May 2011 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 18 May 2011 Not submitted
Annual return 18 May 2010 11 March 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 18 May 2010 15 March 2011 On Time
Annual return 18 May 2009 17 March 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 18 May 2009 17 March 2010 On Time