STROUD VALLEYS ARTSPACE LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance the education of the public in practice and appreciation of the arts.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £77,216 from 3 government grant(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Gloucestershire
Governance
- 22 July 2004: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Duncan Walthew | Trustee | 17 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
David Elford | Trustee | 29 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Potts | Trustee | 05 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Robert Duncan | Trustee | 05 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
FERN BYWATER | Trustee | 16 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Kaoru Blackstone | Trustee | 26 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Barney Heywood | Trustee | 07 December 2016 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW MICHAEL FREEDMAN | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £271.52k | £168.68k | £295.00k | £238.18k | £300.51k | |
|
Total expenditure | £276.80k | £86.45k | £270.85k | £314.23k | £447.82k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £112.04k | £147.41k | £137.15k | £84.32k | £77.22k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 17 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 17 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 07 February 2024 | 7 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 07 February 2024 | 7 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 16 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | 24 March 2023 | 24 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 24 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | 24 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 18 NOVEMBER 1997 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED I JUNE 2004.
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THE RESIDENTS OF STROUD AND ITS ENVIRONS, IN THE PRACTICE AND APPRECIATION OF THE ARTS, BY ALL OR ANY OF THE FOLLOWING MEANS: (A) TO ORGANISE AND HOLD EXHIBITIONS, CONFERENCES, WORKSHOPS AND TRAINING COURSES IN THE FIELD OF THE ARTS; (B) TO PROVIDE OR TO ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF CREATIVE STUDIO SPACE; (C) SUCH OTHER WAYS AS DECIDED FROM TIME TO TIME BY THE ASSOCIATION, IN GENERAL MEETING, SO LONG AS SUCH ACTIVITIES DO NOT STOP THE ASSOCIATION BEING RECOGNISED AS A CHARITY IN LAW.
Area of benefit
IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THE RESIDENTS OF STROUD AND ITS ENVIRONS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
STROUD VALLEYS ARTSPACE
4 JOHN STREET
STROUD
GL5 2HA
- Phone:
- 01453751440
- Email:
- office@sva.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window