Trustees STROUD VALLEYS ARTSPACE LIMITED
Charity Number: 1105051

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Duncan Walthew | Trustee | 17 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
David Elford | Trustee | 29 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Potts | Trustee | 05 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Robert Duncan | Trustee | 05 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
FERN BYWATER | Trustee | 16 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Kaoru Blackstone | Trustee | 26 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Barney Heywood | Trustee | 07 December 2016 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW MICHAEL FREEDMAN | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.