Financial history WHITCHURCH FOLK HOUSE ASSOCIATION LTD

Charity number: 1102089
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £20.69k £38 £241 £335 £7.69k
Total expenditure £14.64k £19.27k £16.97k £23.61k £27.87k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A