Financial history SOUTH WEST HERTS U3A

Charity number: 1101279
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £13.34k £11.43k £832 £12.92k £12.46k
Total expenditure £15.57k £4.96k £8.30k £12.67k £13.09k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A