THE ARISAIG PARTNERS FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1101494
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Principally focused on providing education opportunities for the young in less developed countries.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £243,672
Total expenditure: £378,500

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Accommodation/housing
  • Economic/community Development/employment
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Cambodia
  • India
  • Kenya
  • Pakistan
  • Philippines
  • Scotland
  • Singapore
  • Thailand

Governance

Registration history:
  • 13 January 2004: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Gordon Tian Wee Yeo Trustee 28 May 2024
None on record
Rebecca Lewis Trustee 08 August 2023
None on record
Vatsal Mody Trustee 05 May 2021
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £1.03m £373.45k £423.33k £280.07k £243.67k
Total expenditure £440.99k £614.12k £169.28k £350.04k £378.50k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £814.00k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Endowments £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Investment £214.45k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Legacies £814.00k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £428.11k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £12.89k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £21.93k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £365.56k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £12.89k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 28 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 28 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 24 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 24 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 27 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 31 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 29 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 29 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 26 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 26 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Suite 5
7th Floor
50 Broadway
London
SW1H 0DB
Phone:
6565323378