Accounts and annual returns LIVING STONE CHURCH

Charity number: 1103710
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 January 2024 04 March 2025 94 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 January 2024 Not Required
Annual return 30 January 2023 04 March 2025 460 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 January 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 January 2022 04 March 2025 825 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 January 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 January 2021 04 March 2025 1190 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 January 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 January 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1615 days
Accounts and TAR 30 January 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1615 days