NOBLE TREE FOUNDATION LIMITED


Charity overview
Regulatory alerts
- The Charity Commission has opened an inquiry Open in new window into the charity
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Noble Tree Foundation provides housing for vulnerable people in the UK and provides education and training in the UK and internationally
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2022
Total income:
£9,757,500
Donations and legacies | £1.95k | |
Charitable activities | £1.98m | |
Other trading activities | £7.78m | |
Investments | £758 | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£8,869,428
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £8.87m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £8.87m | |
Retained for future use | £888.07k |
People

1 Employee(s)
5 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- China
- France
- Germany
- Hong Kong
Governance
- 04 May 2004: Standard registration
- BTJUK (Working name)
- LOVE CHINA INTERNATIONAL (Previous name)
- THE BTJ FOUNDATION (Previous name)
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Harald Torbjorn Gabriel Jakob Kinde | Chair | 04 May 2004 |
|
|
||||
Dean Gordon | Trustee | 14 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Carmen rodney Rodney | Trustee | 07 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Kane Fearnley | Trustee | 28 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Peter West | Trustee | 02 April 2016 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 21/06/2018 | 21/06/2019 | 21/12/2020 | 21/12/2021 | 30/11/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.09k | £3.22k | £4.24m | £2.16m | £9.76m | |
|
Total expenditure | £592 | £98 | £526.51k | £3.16m | £8.87m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | £4.06m | £376.79k | £1.95k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £7.78m | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £0 | £1.74m | £1.98m | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | £185.55k | £40.61k | £758 | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | £0 | £1.40k | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £526.51k | £3.16m | £8.87m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 21/06/2018 | 21/06/2019 | 21/12/2020 | 21/12/2021 | 30/11/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | N/A | N/A | £2.76m | £162.26k | £3.01m | |
|
Long-term investments | N/A | N/A | £2 | £2.82m | £162.26k | |
|
Other assets | N/A | N/A | £1.13m | £230.59k | £1.17m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | N/A | N/A | £159.63k | £1.26m | £1.52m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | |||
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | |||
Accounts and TAR |
30 November 2022
(These accounts |
|||
Annual return | 21 December 2021 | |||
Accounts and TAR |
21 December 2021
(These accounts |
|||
Annual return | 21 December 2020 | |||
Accounts and TAR |
21 December 2020
(These accounts |
|||
Annual return | 21 June 2019 | 04 May 2020 | 13 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 21 June 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 17 NOV 2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 10 APR 2004 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 25 OCT 2011 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 24 MAR 2016 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 10 DEC 2020 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 04 JAN 2021
Charitable objects
THE COMPANY'S OBJECTS ('THE OBJECTS') ARE: 3.1.1 TO ADVANCE RELIGION BY DECLARING WORLDWIDE THE GOSPEL OF THE LORD JESUS CHRIST; AND 3.1.2 THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION WORLDWIDE IN SUCH SUBJECTS AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL DECIDE 3.1.3 THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED, BY REASON OF YOUTH, AGE, ILL-HEALTH, DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR OTHER DISADVANTAGE
Area of benefit
WORLDWIDE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
CBW RECOVERY LLB
10 LOWER THAMES STREET
LONDON
LONDON
EC3R 6AF
- Phone:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window