Accounts and annual returns TRIMLEY RED DEVILS FOOTBALL CLUB

Charity number: 1102408
Charity reporting is overdue by 102 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 102 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 102 days
Annual return 31 March 2023 17 June 2024 138 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2022 05 April 2023 5 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2021 05 May 2022 35 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2020 02 June 2021 63 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 Not Required