GRAHAME CHARITABLE FOUNDATION LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Advancement of education, religion and the relief of poverty
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Throughout London
Governance
- 25 February 2004: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ethan Zachary Greenwood | Trustee | 26 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Joel Amichai Greenwood | Trustee | 29 December 2016 |
|
|
||||
Sara Michal Shaw | Trustee | 29 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
ALAN GRAHAME | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £186.79k | £131.68k | £338.69k | £188.58k | £226.32k | |
|
Total expenditure | £174.39k | £208.47k | £333.18k | £207.76k | £262.20k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 22 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 22 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 15 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 15 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 06 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 06 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 19 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 19 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 8 JANUARY 2004.
Charitable objects
TO USE PAY AND APPLY THE WHOLE OR PART OR PARTS OF THE INCOME OF THE CHARITY TO OR TOWARDS SUCH CHARITABLE BODY OR BODIES OR SUCH CHARITABLE BODIES OR SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSE OR PURPOSES WHETHER IN THE UNITED KINGDOM OR ELSEWHERE IN SUCH SHARES AND IN SUCH MANNER AS THE CHARITY SHALL IN ITS ABSOLUTE AND UNFETTERED DISCRETION AT ANY TIME OR TIMES AND FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE. THE ABOVE INCLUDES, WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING, CHARITABLE BODIES ESTABLISHED FOR THE FOLLOWING PURPOSES: (A) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD (B) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD (C) THE ADVANCEMENT OF RELIGION ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD AND SO THAT THE CHARITY ITSELF MAY APPLY SUCH INCOME FOR CHARITABLE PURPOSES, OR PAY THE SAME TO PERSON OR PERSONS, INSTITUTION OR INSTITUTIONS, AS THE CHARITY MAY IN ITS LIKE DISCRETION SELECT TO BE APPLIED BY SUCH PERSON OR PERSONS, INSTITUTION OR INSTITUTIONS, FOR CHARITABLE PURPOSES.
Area of benefit
ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD.
Contact information
- Address:
-
UNIT 102
NO UNSOLICITED MAIL
116 Ballards Lane
FINCHLEY
N3 2DN
- Phone:
- 07710221636
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window