Financial history VOICE OF HOPE RADIO

Charity number: 1106103
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £49.70k £64.65k £54.74k £36.84k £29.22k
Total expenditure £32.09k £47.82k £58.20k £43.84k £43.38k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £1.20k N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A