THE PRINCE'S SCHOOL OF TRADITIONAL ARTS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Prince's School specialises in teaching, researching, and promoting the practice and theory of the arts and crafts of the world's great traditions.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Other Charitable Activities
- Birmingham City
- Cambridgeshire
- Lancashire
- Shropshire
- Throughout London
Governance
- 07 October 2008: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Emily Cherrintgon | Trustee | 01 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Gordon Richards | Trustee | 04 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Gordon James Neil | Trustee | 23 March 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £137.31k | £83.14k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.49m | £4.35m | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 12 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 09 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 14 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 16 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 16 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 15 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 15 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 20/11/2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 31/03/2013
Charitable objects
SUCH PURPOSES AS ARE CHARITABLE UNDER THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AND IN PARTICULAR (BUT WITHOUT LIMITATION):- 1. THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE PRACTICE AND APPLICATION OF THE TRADITIONAL ARTS AND ARCHITECTURE OF ISLAM AND OTHER CIVILISATIONS; AND 2. THE PROMOTION OF THE PRACTICE AND APPRECIATION OF SUCH TRADITIONAL ARTS AND ARCHITECTURE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE WORLDWIDE.
Linked charities
- 07 October 2008 : Standard registration
Contact information
- Address:
-
Charlotte Road
Shoreditch
London
London
EC2A 3SG
- Phone:
- +44(0)20 76138500
- Email:
- enquiry2@psta.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window