THE ROYAL DRAWING SCHOOL

Charity number: 1101538
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To facilitate and promote the practice of drawing from observation; we believe that this is crucial for all aspects of visual learning, thinking and practice. We aim to fill a gap left by the steady erosion of observational drawing from the study of art in higher education and in schools by offering tuition and resources to art students, artists, children and the public.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout London
  • Scotland

Governance

Registration history:
  • 14 January 2004: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • THE PRINCE'S DRAWING SCHOOL (Previous name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Sir Charles Robert Saumarez Smith Chair 19 June 2019
THE WATERCOLOUR WORLD
Received: On time
THE GARDEN MUSEUM
Received: On time
CASTLE HOWARD FOUNDATION
Recently registered
Timothy Aidan John Knox Trustee 21 June 2023
MODERN ART PRESS
Received: On time
Dr Mary Wellesley Trustee 21 June 2023
None on record
Mariam Fazal Faruqi Trustee 21 June 2023
None on record
Elizabeth Sorensen Trustee 21 June 2023
None on record
Fope Adelowo Trustee 24 March 2021
None on record
NICHOLAS JOHN VETCH Trustee 27 January 2021
ASHFORD TRUST
Received: On time
Matthew Rice Trustee 18 June 2020
None on record
Glenda Adrianne Bailey OBE DBE Trustee 18 June 2020
None on record
Professor Eileen Hogan Trustee 28 February 2018
None on record
Hon David Maurice Benjamin Macmillan Trustee 24 February 2016
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £3.45m £2.49m £2.57m £3.17m £3.65m
Total expenditure £3.39m £3.11m £3.25m £3.16m £3.79m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £26.41k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £2.13m £2.11m £1.86m £1.81m £2.22m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £132.65k
Income - Charitable activities £862.83k £911.44k £1.17m £1.21m £1.22m
Income - Endowments £0 £607.10k £472.00k £0 £0
Income - Investment £258.84k £72.49k £456 £545 £68.95k
Income - Other £201.38k £0 £0 £156.68k £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £3.03m £2.81m £2.80m £2.83m £2.71m
Expenditure - Raising funds £364.36k £296.46k £450.78k £334.55k £451.19k
Expenditure - Governance £41.64k £16.14k £44.12k £38.00k £54.35k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £239.62k £3.38k £44.86k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £628.27k

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Own use assets £2.40m £2.30m £2.24m £2.49m £2.40m
Long-term investments £9.12m £9.17m £14.45m £13.35m £13.10m
Other assets £3.04m £3.09m £2.25m £2.31m £3.29m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £659.89k £751.63k £540.09k £603.81k £1.05m

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 27 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 27 June 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 26 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 26 June 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 30 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 30 June 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 30 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 30 June 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 26 June 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 26 June 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
19-22 CHARLOTTE ROAD
LONDON
EC2A 3SG
Phone:
02076138568