THE ROY AND PIXIE BAKER CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Support registered charitable institutions and particularly those in the North East whose objects are in line with the Trust Deed
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 10 February 2004: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANTHONY ARTHUR EDWARD GLENTON | Chair |
|
||||||||||||
Sophie Louise Glenton Smith | Trustee | 12 September 2023 |
|
|||||||||||
MR WILLIAM JOSEPH DRYDEN | Trustee | 07 February 2012 |
|
|||||||||||
LESLIE AUSTIN CAISLEY | Trustee |
|
||||||||||||
GEORGE WILLIAM STRAKER FCA | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £74.69k | £56.89k | £54.13k | £65.84k | £84.21k | |
|
Total expenditure | £90.33k | £63.39k | £65.64k | £104.96k | £107.46k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 02 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 02 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 04 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 04 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 28 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 28 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 23 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 23 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 04 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 04 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 6 MARCH 1995.
Charitable objects
TO SUPPORT BY GRANT OF SUBSCRIPTION OR DONATION ANY REGISTERED CHARITABLE INSTITUTION OR INSTITUTIONS WHOSE OBJECTS INCLUDE (A) THE RELIEF OF PATIENTS SUFFERING FROM ANY FORM OF ILLNESS OR DISEASE THE PROMOTION OF RESEARCH INTO THE CAUSES AND TREATMENT OF SUCH ILLNESS OR DISEASE AND THE PROVISION OF MEDICAL EQUIPMENT FOR SUCH PATIENTS (B) THE FURTHERANCE OF THE GENERAL EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PERSONS BY THE AWARD OF SCHOLARSHIPS EXHIBITIONS BURSARIES OR MAINTENANCE ALLOWANCES TENABLE AT ANY SCHOOL UNIVERSITY OR OTHER EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENT APPROVED BY THE TRUSTEES TO PERSONS IN ENGLAND WHO ARE IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE (C) THE PROTECTION AND PRESERVATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN ENGLAND SUCH FEATURES OF CITIES TOWNS VILLAGES AND THE COUNTRYSIDE AS ARE OF SPECIAL ENVIRONMENTAL HISTORICAL OR ARCHITECTURAL INTEREST (D) THE RELIEF OF PERSONS WHETHER OR NOT THEY ARE RESIDENT IN ENGLAND WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS AS A RESULT OF LOCAL NATIONAL OR INTERNATIONAL DISASTER OR BY REASON OF THEIR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
32 PORTLAND TERRACE
NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE
NE2 1QP
- Phone:
- 01912811292
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window