Governing document EASTERN LEADERSHIP CENTRE
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 7 FEBRUARY 2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS ON 23 JUNE 2003 AND 20 SEPTEMBER 2004 AND 4 OCTOBER 2004 AND 6 DECEMBER 2004.
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, IN PARTICULAR (WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY) BY PROMOTING, IMPROVING AND DEVELOPING EDUCATION LEADERSHIP IN SCHOOLS, LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITIES AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS SUPPORTING OR PROVIDING EDUCATION REGIONALLY, NATIONALLY AND INTERNATIONALLY.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.