COLLEGE OF SEXUAL AND RELATIONSHIP THERAPISTS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provides advocacy/advice/information Sponsors or undertakes research
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
16 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 06 February 2004: Standard registration
- BRITISH ASSOCIATION FOR SEXUAL AND RELATIONSHIP THERAPY (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Wafaa Mohamed Farid Eltantawy | Trustee | 25 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Bernd Leygraf | Trustee | 25 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
David Robert Piner | Trustee | 25 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Chris Amento Ayi Boccovi | Trustee | 25 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Imelda Hatton Yeo | Trustee | 09 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lohani Noor | Trustee | 09 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Markie Louise Christianson Twist | Trustee | 09 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Cate Campbell | Trustee | 15 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Murray Blacket | Trustee | 15 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Richmond Johnson | Trustee | 16 September 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £264.95k | £319.29k | £355.75k | £344.96k | £342.56k | |
|
Total expenditure | £249.35k | £221.75k | £265.99k | £261.33k | £333.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 24 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 24 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 24 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 24 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 26 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 26 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 06 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 06 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 17/12/2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 07/06/2008 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 11/01/2011 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 12/07/2014
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN SEXUAL, COUPLE AND RELATIONSHIP THERAPY FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: 1. THE PROVISION OF, AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF TRAINING FOR THOSE ENGAGED IN SEXUAL, COUPLE AND RELATIONSHIP THERAPY; 2. FORMULATING AND MONITORING STANDARDS OF PROFESSIONAL CONDUCT AND COMPETENCE FOR THOSE ENGAGED IN SEXUAL, COUPLE AND RELATIONSHIP THERAPY; AND 3. PROMOTING RESEARCH IN THE FIELDS OF MARRIAGE AND OTHER INTIMATE RELATIONSHIPS; SEXUAL, COUPLE AND RELATIONSHIP THERAPY AND HUMAN SEXUALITY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
SUITE 48987
PO BOX 6945
LONDON
W1A 6US
- Phone:
- 02081069635
- Email:
- ceo@cosrt.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window