Accounts and annual returns THE DIAMOND FAMILY FOUNDATION LIMITED

Charity number: 1101380
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2015 27 January 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2015 27 January 2016 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2014 27 January 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2014 28 January 2015 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2013 28 January 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2013 28 January 2014 On Time