LEEDS IRISH ARTS FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To further the education of the public, in particular to provide access to and participation in traditional Irish music and arts through classes, workshops, access to materials, resources, promotion and performance
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
Total income includes £23,153 from 4 government grant(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Leeds City
Governance
- 21 January 2004: Standard registration
- IRISH ARTS FOUNDATION (Working name)
- HAREHILLS IRISH MUSIC PROJECT LEEDS (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Amanda Elizabeth Burton | Trustee | 20 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
John O'Dwyer | Trustee | 28 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr Patrick Bourne | Trustee | 25 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
SEAN STOWELL | Trustee | 24 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
TARA MCSTAY | Trustee | 16 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
OLIVER JAMES ENGLEY | Trustee | 03 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
KIERON MULLOY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JO HEYWORTH | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £61.49k | £80.06k | £88.85k | £94.28k | £78.63k | |
|
Total expenditure | £68.94k | £66.28k | £61.90k | £80.21k | £82.23k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £9.46k | N/A | £11.73k | £50.08k | £23.15k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 08 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 08 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 02 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 02 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 13 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 13 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 19 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 19 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 20 February 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 20 February 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 9 OCTOBER 2003, AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 30TH MARCH 2006 AND CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 27TH APRIL 2006
Charitable objects
TO FURTHER THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC, IN PARTICULAR TO PROVIDE ACCESS TO AND PARTICIPATION IN TRADITIONAL IRISH MUSIC AND ARTS THROUGH CLASSES, WORKSHOPS, ACCESS TO MATERIALS, RESOURCES, PROMOTION AND PERFORMANCE
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE LEEDS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Headingley Enterprise & Arts Centre
Bennett Road
LEEDS
LS6 3HN
- Phone:
- 07855891541
- Email:
- info@irisharts.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window