CUMBRIA CHRISTIAN LEARNING

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
RELIGIOUS ACTIVITIES
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Human Resources
- Cumbria
Governance
- 22 July 2004: Standard registration
- CBDTI (Working name)
- CARLISLE AND BLACKBURN DIOCESAN TRAINING INSTITUTE (Previous name)
- LANCASHIRE AND CUMBRIA THEOLOGICAL PARTNERSHIP (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Professor Robert Hannaford MA PhD | Chair |
|
|
|||||
PROFESSOR ANNE GARDEN | Trustee | 01 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Martin Lawson | Trustee | 01 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
DEREK SIMON HURTON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £137.73k | £90.91k | £46.58k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £133.95k | £88.26k | £52.88k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 23 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 26 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 26 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 26 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 26 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 9 APRIL 2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 7 JUNE 2004 AND CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION UPON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 4 SEPTEMBER 2007 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 05 DEC 2017
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION THROUGH THE PROVISION OF THEOLOGICAL EDUCATION AND MINISTERIAL TRAINING TO RECOGNISED CANDIDATES FOR ORDAINED MINISTRY IN THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND, THE METHODIST CHURCH, THE UNITED REFORMED CHURCH AND IN OTHER MAINSTREAM CHRISTIAN CHURCHES AND, WHERE APPROPRIATE, FOR THE PREPARATION OF SUITABLE CANDIDATES FOR LAY MINISTRY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE CARLISLE, BLACKBURN AND BRADFORD.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Carlisle Diocesan Board of Finance
Church House
19-24 Friargate
PENRITH
CA11 7XR
- Phone:
- 01768807777
- Website:
-
cumbriachristianlearning.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window