FALCON SUPPORT SERVICES E.M LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
FALCON SUPPORT SERVICES E.M LTD HELPS HOMELESS AND DISADVANTAGED VULNERABLE ADULTS LIVING IN LEICESTERSHIRE AND RUTLAND. THE CHARITY PROVIDES HOUSING SUPPORT SERVICES, COMMUNITY SUPPORT AND RECOVER SERVICES TO HELP PEOPLE TO LIVE INDEPENDENTLY AND POSITIVELY CONTRIBUTE TO THEIR COMMUNITY. WE STRIVE TO RE-CONNECT THE MOST EXCLUDED AND BELIEVE THAT WHERE YOU ARE TODAY DOES NOT DEFINE YOUR TOMORROW.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£3,295,699
Donations and legacies | £124.69k | |
Charitable activities | £3.17m | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £0 | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£3,203,472
Raising funds | £81.97k | |
Charitable activities | £3.12m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £650,632 from 9 government contract(s) and £222,716 from 12 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £81.97k | |
Charitable expenditure | £3.12m | |
Retained for future use | £92.23k |
People

101 Employee(s)
7 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Accommodation/housing
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Leicestershire
Governance
- 06 April 2004: Standard registration
- 09 June 2015: Funds received from 519826 NORTH WEST LEICESTERSHIRE HOMELESS PROJECT
- CHARNWOOD INDEPENDENT YOUTH ACTION (Previous name)
- LOUGHBOROUGH NIGHTSTOP (Previous name)
- YOUTH SHELTER (Previous name)
- Care Quality Commission
- Financial Conduct Authority
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
William Robert Sharp | Chair | 01 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Simon Brighty | Trustee | 15 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Peter Mark Cannon | Trustee | 05 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jason King | Trustee | 08 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Graham Thomas Edward Hunt | Trustee | 14 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
Alicia Butterfield | Trustee | 01 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
JANE ANN GRAY | Trustee | 26 January 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.75m | £2.34m | £2.40m | £2.81m | £3.30m | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.66m | £2.18m | £2.40m | £2.83m | £3.20m | |
|
Income from government contracts | £177.23k | £149.31k | £140.00k | £431.37k | £650.63k | |
|
Income from government grants | £23.63k | £156.36k | £324.35k | £157.16k | £222.72k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £12.24k | £39.19k | £44.72k | £64.42k | £124.69k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £1.75m | £2.30m | £2.36m | £2.74m | £3.17m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £1.66m | £2.17m | £2.39m | £2.79m | £3.12m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £15.16k | £10.58k | £36.64k | £81.97k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £27.05k | £114.31k | £97.42k | £346.46k | £316.03k | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £397.38k | £524.15k | £498.48k | £414.38k | £517.62k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £74.63k | £126.73k | £85.92k | £272.08k | £252.65k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 13 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 13 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 16 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 16 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 15 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 15 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 02 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 02 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 06 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 06 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 12/03/2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 29/12/2003 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 17/01/2012 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 03/12/2015 as amended on 21 Mar 2024
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF NEED, HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS EXPERIENCED BY HOMELESS PEOPLE AND DISADVANTAGED GROUPS, REGARDLESS OF AGE BY THE PROVISION OF EMERGENCY AND OTHER TEMPORARY ACCOMMODATION AND BY THE PROVISION OF SUPPORT AND ADVICE SERVICES CALCULATED TO RELIEVE THEIR CONDITIONS OF NEED.
Area of benefit
WITHIN THE BOROUGH OF CHARNWOOD AND THE COUNTY OF LEICESTERSHIRE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Falcon Centre
29 Pinfold Gate
Loughborough
LE11 1BE
- Phone:
- 01509268699
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window