Accounts and annual returns KISHINCHAND CHELLARAM FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1101569
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 25 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 25 September 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2023 20 March 2024 44 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 20 March 2024 44 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2022 01 February 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2021 28 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2020 05 February 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required