GO 4 IT
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2005
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Cambridgeshire
Governance
- 23 August 2004: Standard registration
- 03 May 2008: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2005 | |
---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2005 | 10 April 2007 | 406 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2005 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 25 NOVEMBER 2003, AS AMENDED 25 JUNE 2004
Charitable objects
1) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF DISABLED PEOPLE IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT LIMITED TO EDUCATIONAL COURSES. 2) TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATIONAL, SPORTING AND OTHER LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES FOR DISABLED PEOPLE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE. GO4IT WILL AT ALL TIME BE GOVERNED BY THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window