Accounts and annual returns HARBORNE AND EDGBASTON U3A

Charity number: 1101356
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2024 25 February 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2024 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2023 16 August 2024 17 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2022 29 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2021 23 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2020 02 September 2021 34 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required