HARBORNE AND EDGBASTON U3A

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity advances the education of the public, in particular people not in paid employment in Harborne and Edgbaston and the surrounding locality by providing opportunities for leisure time, learning and recreational activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Human Resources
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Birmingham City
Governance
- 05 January 2004: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Enrico Poletti | Trustee | 12 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Davis Coley | Trustee | 04 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Christina Sally Howard | Trustee | 05 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Glenis Poletti | Trustee | 05 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Angela Harvatt | Trustee | 05 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Jane Street | Trustee | 07 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Susan Hendry | Trustee | 07 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Veronica Richards | Trustee | 01 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ian Trotter | Trustee | 29 October 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.19k | £5.63k | £3.76k | £5.83k | £9.69k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.96k | £3.24k | £4.38k | £5.19k | £5.31k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 25 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 16 August 2024 | 17 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 29 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 23 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 02 September 2021 | 34 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 1 JUNE 1999 as amended on 02 Dec 2020 as amended on 26 Jul 2023
Charitable objects
(1) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC AND IN PARTICULAR THE EDUCATION OF OLDER PEOPLE NO LONGER IN FULL TIME GAINFUL EMPLOYMENT, IN HARBOURNE AND THE SURROUNDING LOCALITY. (2) TO PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR LEISURE TIME AND RECREATIONAL ACTIVITIES.
Area of benefit
HARBOURNE AND SURROUNDING LOCALITY
Contact information
- Address:
-
31 Knightlow Road
Harborne
Birmingham
B17 8PS
- Phone:
- 07800508852
- Email:
- u3a.harborne@gmail.com
- Website:
-
hande.u3asite.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window