Trustees HARBORNE AND EDGBASTON U3A
Charity number: 1101356

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Enrico Poletti | Trustee | 12 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Davis Coley | Trustee | 04 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Christina Sally Howard | Trustee | 05 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Glenis Poletti | Trustee | 05 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Angela Harvatt | Trustee | 05 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Jane Street | Trustee | 07 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Susan Hendry | Trustee | 07 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Veronica Richards | Trustee | 01 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ian Trotter | Trustee | 29 October 2021 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.