THE HOLLOW LANE CLUB
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Hollow Lane Club is dedicated to enhancing the lives of children and young people with special needs and their families, by providing fun and involving out-of-school activities for the children and their siblings, after school, at weekends and in the school holidays, at several central locations.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2019
Total income includes £15,000 from 2 government grant(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Devon
Governance
- 15 March 2004: Standard registration
- 03 February 2021: Removed (Funds transferred (gi))
- 03 February 2021: Funds transferred to 1186520 THE HOLLOW LANE CLUB
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2015 | 30/09/2016 | 30/09/2017 | 30/09/2018 | 31/12/2019 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £100.82k | £108.34k | £94.39k | £165.29k | £255.60k | |
|
Total expenditure | £97.04k | £107.97k | £120.96k | £140.41k | £230.34k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £4.89k | £7.00k | £0 | £20.00k | £15.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 11 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 11 June 2020 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 September 2018 | 09 April 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2018 | 09 April 2019 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 September 2017 | 24 February 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2017 | 19 February 2018 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 16 DECEMBER 2003 AS AMENDED 10 MARCH 2004.
Charitable objects
A) TO PROVIDE THE NECESSARY FACILITIES FOR THE DAILY CARE, RECREATION AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN WITH DISABILITIES AND THEIR SIBLINGS DURING AFTER SCHOOL HOURS AND SCHOOL HOLIDAYS. B) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF THE PERSONS IN THE PROVISIONS OF SUCH CARE, EDUCATION AND RECREATIONAL FACILITIES.
Area of benefit
DEVON
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window